Scott v. Oklahoma Steel and Wire

Plaintiff: Yannash U. Scott, Sr.
Defendant: Oklahoma Steel and Wire
Case Number: 6:2018cv00336
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12181
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing parties to file their Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report no later than 1/8/2019 (tls, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer due no later than 12/17/2018 (tls, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Oklahoma Steel and Wire Responses due by 12/17/2018(Hutson, Allen)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Oklahoma Steel and Wire (Hutson, Allen)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Melissa R. McDuffey on behalf of Oklahoma Steel and Wire (McDuffey, Melissa)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Allen L. Hutson on behalf of Oklahoma Steel and Wire (Hutson, Allen)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Re: #2 Complaint) by Yannash U. Scott, Sr (Golden, Brenda) Modified on 11/20/2018 to edit event, text and link (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting in part #5 Motion to Appoint Process Server (tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Process Server (Re: #4 Summons Issued) by Yannash U. Scott, Sr.; Responses due by 11/1/2018(Golden, Brenda)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Oklahoma Steel and Wire (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2018 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 10/16/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1214754 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Yannash U. Scott, Sr (Golden, Brenda)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. (Filing Fee due by 10/16/2018)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Oklahoma Steel and Wire by Yannash U. Scott, Sr. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Yannash U. Scott, Sr. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Oklahoma Steel and Wire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yannash U. Scott, Sr.
Represented By: Brenda S. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Steel and Wire
Represented By: Melissa R. McDuffey
Represented By: Allen L. Hutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?