Nguyen v. Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Thi Phuong Thao Nguyen
Defendant: Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2018cv00342
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company (Cordell, F.)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - This Court acknowledges the random assignment of this case. By separate electronic mail transmission from the Clerk of this Court, the parties have been provided the Notice of Assignment to a United States Magistrate Judge With Consent to Proceed or District Judge Option form for completion and submission. If you have not received a copy of the Notice from the Clerk, a copy may be obtained on this District's website at www.oked.uscourts.gov under the tab for Forms and is titled Consent or District Judge Option Form. The parties shall submit a completed Consent/District Judge Option form by DECEMBER 14, 2018.(adw, Deputy Clerk)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference set 12/17/2018 at 9:45 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company (Cordell, F.)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amanda R. Mullins on behalf of Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company (Mullins, Amanda)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by F. Thomas Cordell on behalf of Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company (Cordell, F.)
October 15, 2018 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 10/15/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1214656 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) by Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company (sms, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk,. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 10/22/2018)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from McCurtain County District Court, case number CJ-2018-15 by Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company by Thi Phuong Thao Nguyen (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thi Phuong Thao Nguyen
Represented By: Jeremiah Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: F. Thomas Cordell
Represented By: Amanda R. Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?