Nolan v. American General Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Mary Jane Nolan
Defendant: United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York, American General Life Insurance Company, AIG Benefit Solutions and Upper Northwest Financial Services Association
Case Number: 6:2018cv00345
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
0 Judge: Kimberly E West
1 Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: Amended Pleadings due by 12/28/2018; Joinder of Parties due by 12/28/2018; Exhibit List due by 5/7/2019; Witness List due by 5/7/2019; Discovery due by 6/7/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 6/14/2019; Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 7/18/2019; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/18/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 11:30 AM in Chambers, Room 227, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Ronald A. White; Jury Trial set for 8/6/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Room 224, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Ronald A. White (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
November 30, 2018 Filing 15 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Mary Jane Nolan (Marcum, Thomas)
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Mary Jane Nolan (Marcum, Thomas)
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by American General Life Insurance Company, United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York (Bowman, Andrew)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: Directing parties to file their disclosures and Joint Status Report no later than 11/30/2018 (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and hearings set before Magistrate Judge West are hereby stricken. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 18-345-RAW.(adw, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AGC Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent AIG Life Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent SAFG Retirement Services, Inc. for United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York) by United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York (Bowman, Andrew)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AGC Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent AIG Life Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent SAFG Retirement Services, Inc. for American General Life Insurance Company) by American General Life Insurance Company (Bowman, Andrew)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, ) by United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York (Bowman, Andrew)
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, ) by American General Life Insurance Company (Bowman, Andrew)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 12/17/2018 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew M. Bowman on behalf of American General Life Insurance Company, United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York (Bowman, Andrew)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Larry D. Ottaway on behalf of American General Life Insurance Company, United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York (Ottaway, Larry)
October 19, 2018 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 10/19/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1215891 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by American General Life Insurance Company, United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York (Bowman, Andrew)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendants are directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 10/26/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Bryan County District Court, case number 18-CJ-136 by American General Life Insurance Company, United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by American General Life Insurance Company, United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2018 PETITION with Jury Demand filed in State Court against AIG Benefit Solutions, American General Life Insurance Company, United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York, Upper Northwest Financial Services Association by Mary Jane Nolan (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nolan v. American General Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jane Nolan
Represented By: Thomas Marcum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Life Insurance Company in the City of New York
Represented By: Larry D. Ottaway
Represented By: Andrew M. Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Larry D. Ottaway
Represented By: Andrew M. Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Benefit Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upper Northwest Financial Services Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?