Seminole County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Plaintiff: Seminole County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Christopher Moses, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Allergan, PLC, Insys Therapeutic, Inc., Tamerlane Rozsa, Joseph Knight, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Joshua Livingston, Actavis, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Allergan Finance, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Purdue Pharma, LP, Roger Kinney, Walmart, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
Case Number: 6:2018cv00372
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: James H Payne
Referring Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care - Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation (With attachments) Responses due by 1/16/2019(Campbell, Stuart)
January 2, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #28 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by McKesson Corporation ; (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart)
January 2, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #28 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ; (With attachments)(Zschiesche, Raymond)
December 17, 2018 Filing 29 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #28 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by Seminole County Board of County Commissioners ;(Gibbs, George)
December 17, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Seminole County Board of County Commissioners Responses due by 1/2/2019(Gibbs, George)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne: granting #24 Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition as to Defendants AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc. and McKesson Corporation (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2018 Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of Judge Ronald A. White and at the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to Judge James H. Payne. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-18-372-JHP. (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2018 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-18-372-RAW. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
November 30, 2018 Filing 24 Unopposed Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation Responses due by 12/14/2018(Campbell, Stuart)
November 30, 2018 Filing 23 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael W. Ridgeway on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Ridgeway, Michael)
November 21, 2018 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation (Campbell, Stuart)
November 21, 2018 Filing 21 Supplemental NOTICE of Removal (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) by McKesson Corporation (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart) Modified on 11/28/2018 to edit event and add link (dma, Deputy Clerk).
November 21, 2018 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stuart D. Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Campbell, Stuart)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder: granting #13 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings as to Actavis Pharma, Inc.; Actavis, LLC; Allergan Finance, LLC; Allergan, PLC; Cephalon, Inc.; Endo Health Solutions, Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Insys Therapeutic, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Johnson & Johnson; Mallinckrodt, LLC; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.; Purdue Pharma, Inc.; Purdue Pharma, LP; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Watson Laboratories, Inc. (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder: granting #15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition as to CVS Health Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. and Walmart, Inc. (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2018 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amy Sherry Fischer on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Fischer, Amy)
November 20, 2018 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jordyn Cartmell on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Cartmell, Jordyn)
November 20, 2018 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Walmart, Inc., CVS Health Corporation and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.; Responses due by 12/4/2018(Ottaway, Larry) Modified on 11/26/2018 to add filers (dma, Deputy Clerk).
November 20, 2018 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Larry D. Ottaway on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Ottaway, Larry)
November 20, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 12/4/2018(Sparks, John)
November 20, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Sparks, John)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John H. Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Sparks, John)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E. Huntsman on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Michael McBride, III on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D.)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
November 15, 2018 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 11/15/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1222122 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendants are directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 11/26/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Raymond E. Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) Modified on 11/16/2018: added corporate parent (nm, Deputy Clerk).
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Seminole County District Court, case number 18-CJ-114 by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2018: #45 Exhibit 24 - Summons - Roger Kinney) (pjw, Deputy Clerk).
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seminole County Board of County Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seminole County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: George Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Kaylee Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic, Inc.
Represented By: J. Matthew Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamerlane Rozsa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Robert McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Represented By: Robert McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Robert McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Robert McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Robert McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: D. Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Amy D. White
Represented By: G. Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, LP
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Larry D. Ottaway
Represented By: Jordyn Cartmell
Represented By: Amy Sherry Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Represented By: Michael W. Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?