Sheffield v. Taylor et al
Plaintiff: John Charles Sheffield
Defendant: Gore, Town of and Randy E. Taylor
Case Number: 6:2018cv00408
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 3/15/2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to submit Joint Status Report by 3/11/2019. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT to Magistrate Judge for Disposition of Case with ORDER of Reference thereon by Judge Ronald A. White reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-18-408-SPS.(lal, Deputy Clerk)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Gore, Town of, Randy E. Taylor(in his capacity as a Gore police officer), Randy E. Taylor(individually) (McKelvey, Sean)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Gore, Town of, Randy E. Taylor(in his capacity as a Gore police officer), Randy E. Taylor(individually) (McKelvey, Sean)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by John Charles Sheffield (Sullivan, Frank)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Gore, Town of, Randy E. Taylor(in his capacity as a Gore police officer), Randy E. Taylor(individually) (Clark, Meaghen)
January 4, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 1/4/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1232652 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Gore, Town of, Randy E. Taylor(in his capacity as a Gore police officer), Randy E. Taylor(individually) (McKelvey, Sean)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: Directing parties to file their initial disclosures and Joint Status Report no later than 2/4/2019 (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Meaghen E. Clark on behalf of Gore, Town of, Randy E. Taylor(in his capacity as a Gore police officer), Randy E. Taylor(individually) (Clark, Meaghen)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sean M. McKelvey on behalf of Gore, Town of, Randy E. Taylor(in his capacity as a Gore police officer), Randy E. Taylor(individually) (McKelvey, Sean)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendants are directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling (Filing Fee due by 1/9/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Sequoyah County District Court, case number 18-CJ-39 by Gore, Town of, Randy E. Taylor (in his capacity as a Gore police officer), Randy E. Taylor (individually) (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Gore, Town of, Randy E. Taylor (in his capacity as a Gore police officer), Randy E. Taylor (individually) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheffield v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gore, Town of
Represented By: Sean M. McKelvey
Represented By: Meaghen E. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy E. Taylor
Represented By: Sean M. McKelvey
Represented By: Meaghen E. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Charles Sheffield
Represented By: Frank Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?