Knox v. Carpenter

Petitioner: Antone Lamandingo Knox
Respondent: Mike Carpenter
Case Number: 6:2019cv00050
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Office: Muskogee Office
0 Judge: Kimberly E West
1 Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 24 MANDATE letter from Circuit Court (Re: #23 USCA Decision, #18 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory) (acg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/11/2019 to edit file date (dma, Deputy Clerk).
April 5, 2019 Filing 23 DECISION from Circuit Court dismissing the Appeal (Re: #18 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory) (acg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/11/2019 to edit file date (dma, Deputy Clerk).
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West, directing Respondent to show cause why the writ should not issue and file a response to the petition (Responses due by 5/1/2019) (Re: #1 ) (sjr, Chambers)
March 25, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 3/25/2019 in the amount of $5, receipt number 16529 (Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus) by Antone Lamandingo Knox (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 21 APPEAL NUMBER INFORMATION from Circuit Court assigning Case Number 19-7012 (Re: #18 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory ) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 20 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to U.S. Court of Appeals. Pro Se Appeal Packet mailed to Petitioner (Re: #18 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory ) (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West:Upon review of the file in this case, the Court finds that the petitioner has not submitted a proper motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or paid the $505.00 filing fee for the notice of appeal. The petitioner is directed to submit a properly executed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with original signature and have the Trust Fund Officer at his/her facility complete (with an original signature) the Required Certification (Page 3) and provide a current 6-month financial accounting statement and return the completed motion to the Office of the Clerk or pay the filing fee of $505.00 within 20 days or by 03/28/19. The Clerk is directed to provide the plaintiff with a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis form and an instruction sheet.(acg, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Circuit Court (Interlocutory) (Re: #16 Ruling on Motion for Recusal) by Antone Lamandingo Knox (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/21/2019: #1 Envelope) (acg, Deputy Clerk).
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White, re: Filing Fee (acg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/18/2019 to edit text (dma, Deputy Clerk).
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White : Denying #15 Motion for Recusal and disqualification of District Judge Ronald A. White and Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. Petitioner is granted an additional twenty (20) days to submit the $5.00 filing fee for this action. Filing Fee due by 4/3/2019 (acg, Deputy Clerk)
March 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Recusal and disqualify on both Judges, R.A. White and K.E. West under section 544(2)-(b) F.R.C.F.56(f). by Antone Lamandingo Knox Responses due by 3/25/2019(acg, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 OBJECTION (Re: #13 Ruling on Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ) by Antone Lamandingo Knox (acg, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: Denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Filing Fee due by 3/5/2019(acg, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White, referring case to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-19-50-RAW-KEW. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Oklahoma Western
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING #8 Report and Recommendation, GRANTING #9 Motion to Transfer filed by Antone Lamandingo Knox. This action (including the pending motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, doc. no. 2) is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/11/2019. (llg) [Transferred from okwd on 2/11/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Order by Antone Lamandingo Knox. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb) [Transferred from okwd on 2/11/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Antone Lamandingo Knox, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Antone Lamandingo Knox. The undersigned recommends that the interest of justice warrants the transfer of this matter, including Petitioner's pending motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma. Objections to R&R due by 2/25/2019. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues and terminates the referral to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 2/4/19. (lb) [Transferred from okwd on 2/11/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, #1 , #6 , and #7 to Antone Lamandingo Knox #191626 MCALESTER-OSP P O Box 97 McAlester, OK 74502-0097 to (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 2/11/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell.Signed by the direction of Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/1/19. (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 2/11/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Stephen P. Friot for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case. Signed by the direction of Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/1/19. (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 2/11/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 PREVIOUS Cases (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 2/11/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE (other) titled, "Ex Parte Entry of Appearance - Pro Se" by Antone Lamandingo Knox (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 2/11/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 Memorandum of Law in Support of re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Antone Lamandingo Knox. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 2/11/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antone Lamandingo Knox. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 2/11/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Antone Lamandingo Knox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter from Josh Lee and Assoc, #2 Exhibit 2 - ODOC Custody Assessment Scale, #3 Exhibit 3 - ODOC New Arrival Adjustment Review, #4 Exhibit 4 - Grievance, #5 Envelope)(kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 2/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knox v. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antone Lamandingo Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?