Robertson v. Berns et al
Plaintiff: Michael Clay Robertson
Defendant: United States of America and Martina Kaye Berns
Case Number: 6:2019cv00072
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder directing Plaintiff to show cause within 14 days as to why Defendant Martina Kaye Berns should not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Substitute Party United States of America As Party Defendant by United States of America (With attachments) [NOTE: Attorney Michael J. Cooper added to party United States of America(pty:dft)]. Responses due by 4/22/2019(Cooper, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: United States of America served on William Barr, U.S. Attorney General (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: United States of America served on Brian J. Kuester, U.S. Attorney (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Martina Kaye Berns - Served on 3/18/2019 (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to United States of America - U.S. Attorney General (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Martina Kaye Berns (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER to Plaintiff with Summons forms(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 3/1/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 16427 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Michael Clay Robertson (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Martina Kaye Berns, United States of America by Michael Clay Robertson (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Michael Clay Robertson (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. Berns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Michael J. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martina Kaye Berns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Clay Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?