Halberstadt v. Career Confidential, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hans Halberstadt
Defendant: Peggy Irene McKee and Career Confidential, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00076
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Peggy Irene McKee - Served on 5/1/2019. by Hans Halberstadt (Krages, Bert)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Career Confidential, LLC - Served on 5/1/2019. by Hans Halberstadt (Krages, Bert)
April 3, 2019 ***Remark: Mailed notification of event to Register of Copyrights on this date (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bert P. Krages, II on behalf of Hans Halberstadt (Krages, Bert)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Bert P. Krages, II for Plaintiff, Hans Halberstadt, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Bert P. Krages, II to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number 1086-1250339) by Hans Halberstadt (With attachments) Responses due by 3/27/2019(Erb, Sherry)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Peggy Irene McKee (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Career Confidential, LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
March 6, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 3/6/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1248772 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Hans Halberstadt (sms, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 3/12/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Career Confidential, LLC, Peggy Irene McKee by Hans Halberstadt (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Hans Halberstadt (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halberstadt v. Career Confidential, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Irene McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Career Confidential, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hans Halberstadt
Represented By: Sherry L. Erb
Represented By: Bert P. Krages, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?