Totty v. LogistiCare Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Donna Mae Totty
Defendant: LogistiCare Solutions, LLC and Sooner Ride
Case Number: 6:2019cv00149
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Referring Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Patrick R. Wyrick setting scheduling order dates: Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2019; Joinder of Parties due by 8/16/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2019; Plaintiff's Exhibit List due by 12/6/2019; Defendant's Exhibit List due by 12/16/2019; Plaintiff's Witness List due by 12/6/2019; Defendant's Witness List due by 12/16/2019; Discovery due by 1/10/2020; Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 1/23/2020; Final Pretrial Order due by 1/23/2020; Jury Trial to be set on February 2020 Trial Docket. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT by LogistiCare Solutions, LLC (Leach, William)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET by Judge Patrick R. Wyrick: Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 6/25/2019; Status and Scheduling Conference set for 7/2/2019 at 3:30 PM in Chambers, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 200 N.W. 4th STREET, 5th FLOOR, ROOM 5011, OKLAHOMA CITY, OK before Judge Patrick R. Wyrick. (Attachments: #1 Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael S. McMillin on behalf of LogistiCare Solutions, LLC (McMillin, Michael)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Mark McAlester on behalf of LogistiCare Solutions, LLC (McAlester, J.)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by LogistiCare Solutions, LLC (Leach, William)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Patrick R. Wyrick of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 292(b). Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-149-PRW. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Providence Services Corporation by LogistiCare Solutions, LLC (Leach, William) Modified on 5/16/2019: added corporate parent (nm, Deputy Clerk).
May 14, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 5/14/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1266531 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by LogistiCare Solutions, LLC (Leach, William)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 5/21/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Seminole County District Court, case number 19-CJ-28 by LogistiCare Solutions, LLC (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by LogistiCare Solutions, LLC (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2019 PETITION with Jury Demand filed in State Court against LogistiCare Solutions, LLC by Donna Mae Totty (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Totty v. LogistiCare Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LogistiCare Solutions, LLC
Represented By: William S. Leach
Represented By: Jessica L. Dickerson
Represented By: Michael S. McMillin
Represented By: J. Mark McAlester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sooner Ride
Represented By: William S. Leach
Represented By: Jessica L. Dickerson
Represented By: Michael S. McMillin
Represented By: J. Mark McAlester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Mae Totty
Represented By: Jerry L. Colclazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?