Bishop v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Anita Bishop
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2019cv00160
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: James H Payne
Referring Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF Magistrate Judge's Availability with ORDER thereon by District Judge James H. Payne: denying consent (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE of Complaint re: Social Security Administration (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Anita Bishop (White, Timothy)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration - U. S. Attorney (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration - Regional Counsel (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne, referring case to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number 19-cv-160-JHP-KEW. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne : Finding as moot #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Anita Bishop Responses due by 7/5/2019(White, Timothy)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne: The Court orders Plaintiff to file a notarized IFP Motion and Affidavit no later than July 1, 2019. The completed IFP Motion must indicate what income she receives each month from any source.(acg, Deputy Clerk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Anita Bishop Responses due by 6/5/2019(White, Timothy)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 5/28/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration by Anita Bishop (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Anita Bishop (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Bishop
Represented By: Timothy M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Cheryl R. Triplett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?