United States of America v. Turner et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Peoples National Bank, Kathy Foresee Turner, Jack Dean Turner, McIntosh County Treasurer, Equine Sports Medicine & Surgery, McIntosh County Board of County Commissioners and Oklahoma Tax Commission
Case Number: 6:2019cv00192
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by McIntosh County Board of County Commissioners, McIntosh County Treasurer (Stidham, Gregory)
August 5, 2019 Filing 29 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gregory R. Stidham on behalf of McIntosh County Board of County Commissioners, McIntosh County Treasurer (Stidham, Gregory)
August 5, 2019 Filing 28 *******STRICKEN/WITHDRAWN - Entered in error******THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs by McIntosh County Board of County Commissioners, McIntosh County Treasurer [NOTE: Attorney Gregory R. Stidham added to party McIntosh County Board of County Commissioners(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory R. Stidham added to party McIntosh County Treasurer(pty:dft)]. (Stidham, Gregory) Modified on 8/5/2019 to note striking of entry (sms, Deputy Clerk).
August 1, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Courtney L. Eagan on behalf of Kathy Foresee Turner (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2019 Filing 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Courtney L. Eagan on behalf of Jack Dean Turner (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Kathy Foresee Turner. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 24 PRO SE APPEARANCE by Kathy Foresee Turner. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Jack Dean Turner. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 PRO SE APPEARANCE by Jack Dean Turner. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: McIntosh County Board of County Commissioners - Served on 7/5/2019. by United States of America (Triplett, Cheryl)
July 12, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Equine Sports Medicine & Surgery (With attachments) (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Peoples National Bank (With attachments) (sms, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gregory R. Stidham on behalf of Peoples National Bank (sms, Deputy Clerk)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to McIntosh County Board of County Commissioners (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Oklahoma Tax Commission - Served on 6/24/2019. by United States of America (Triplett, Cheryl)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: McIntosh County Treasurer - Served on 6/27/2019. by United States of America (Triplett, Cheryl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Kathy Foresee Turner - Served on 6/25/2019. by United States of America (Triplett, Cheryl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Jack Dean Turner - Served on 6/25/2019. by United States of America (Triplett, Cheryl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Equine Sports Medicine & Surgery - Served on 6/21/2019. by United States of America (Triplett, Cheryl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Peoples National Bank - Served on 6/22/2019. by United States of America (Triplett, Cheryl)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Oklahoma Tax Commission (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to McIntosh County Treasurer (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to McIntosh County Board of County Commissioners (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Equine Sports Medicine & Surgery (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Peoples National Bank (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Kathy Foresee Turner (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jack Dean Turner (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Equine Sports Medicine & Surgery, McIntosh County Board of County Commissioners, McIntosh County Treasurer, Oklahoma Tax Commission, Peoples National Bank, Jack Dean Turner, Kathy Foresee Turner by United States of America (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peoples National Bank
Represented By: Gregory R. Stidham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Foresee Turner
Represented By: Courtney L. Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Dean Turner
Represented By: Courtney L. Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McIntosh County Treasurer
Represented By: Gregory R. Stidham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equine Sports Medicine & Surgery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McIntosh County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Gregory R. Stidham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Tax Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Cheryl R. Triplett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?