Landers v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Macon Landers
Defendant: BASF SE, BASF Corporation and Monsanto Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv00207
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Monsanto Company - Served on 8/8/2019. by Macon Landers (Waller, Mark)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: BASF Corporation - Served on 8/16/2019. by Macon Landers (Waller, Mark)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to BASF Corporation (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to BASF SE (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Monsanto Company (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/2/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1278384 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Macon Landers (Waller, Mark)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 7/8/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BASF Corporation, BASF SE, Monsanto Company by Macon Landers (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Macon Landers (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/1/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landers v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Macon Landers
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Represented By: Mark A. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?