McWilliams v. Dinapoli et al
Plaintiff: Greg McWilliams
Defendant: Michael Dinapoli and Bryan County Board of County Commissioners
Case Number: 6:2019cv00212
Filed: July 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting hearing(s): Settlement Conference set for 4/2/2020 at 09:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. Settlement Conference Statements due 3/19/2020. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Greg McWilliams (Terrill, Steven)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting scheduling order dates: Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 8/30/2019. Exhibit List due by 2/28/2020. Witness List due by 2/28/2020. Discovery due by 3/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/13/2020. Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 5/1/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/1/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Jury Trial set for 5/19/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Additionally, the Scheduling Conference set for 8/16/2019 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder is hereby STRICKEN. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Court Clerk of Consent by the Parties to Proceed Before the United States Magistrate. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial. (With attachments) (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Michael Dinapoli (Hendrickson, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Greg McWilliams (Bryan, J.)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Bryan County Board of County Commissioners (Poe, Wellon)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Spencer Bryan on behalf of Greg McWilliams (Bryan, J.)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 8/16/2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to file Joint Status Report by 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form) (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Michael Dinapoli (Hendrickson, Jeffrey)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Wellon B. Poe on behalf of Bryan County Board of County Commissioners (Poe, Wellon)
July 10, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/10/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 16977 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) by Michael Dinapoli (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendants are directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 7/15/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Bryan County District Court, case number 19-CJ-33 by Bryan County Board of County Commissioners, Michael Dinapoli (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 4, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Bryan County Board of County Commissioners, Michael Dinapoli (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2019 ANSWER to Petition filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition) by Bryan County Board of County Commissioners (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2019 PETITION with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Bryan County Board of County Commissioners, Michael Dinapoli by Greg McWilliams (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McWilliams v. Dinapoli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dinapoli
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Wellon B. Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg McWilliams
Represented By: Steven J. Terrill
Represented By: J. Spencer Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?