Rozelle v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kevin Rozelle
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2019cv00220
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: James H Payne
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne : This action is dismissed without prejudice due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the order entered on 7/22/19 5 .(case terminated) (acg, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne: Finding Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Supporting Affidavit is incomplete and leaves unanswered questions regarding financial status. Plaintiff states his current residence is in Tennessee. If this is correct, this is not the proper venue to address his IFP motion. A court has discretion in deciding whether or not to grant a civil litigant permission to proceed IFP. Brewer v. City of Overland Park Police Dept, 24 F.Appx 977, 979 (10th Cir. 2002) (citing 28 U.S.C., Section 1915(a)). Accordingly, the Court orders Plaintiff to file a notarized IFP motion and Affidavit no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this case without prejudice(acg, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Kevin Rozelle Responses due by 7/25/2019(White, Timothy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 7/17/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration by Kevin Rozelle (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2019: #1 Exhibit 1 - Attorney Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Signature Page) (jcb, Deputy Clerk).
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kevin Rozelle (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rozelle v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Rozelle
Represented By: Timothy M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?