Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma v. 3MCompany et al
Plaintiff: Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemours Company, The, National Foam, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., E.I. de Pont de Nemours and Company, Doe Defendants 1 to 20, 3M Company and E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv00223
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 ***Remark: Transferred case opened in District of South Carolina, case No. 2:19-cv-02192 (Re: #9 Order, Transferring Case, #8 Order ) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-15) (MDL NO. 2873) transferring case to District of South Carolina (case terminated) (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-15) from United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 JURY DEMAND by 3M Company (Whaley, Phillip)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 3M Company (Whaley, Phillip)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of State Court Clerk Regarding Removal by 3M Company (Whaley, Phillip) Modified on 7/16/2019 to edit event (dma, Deputy Clerk).
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Phillip G. Whaley on behalf of 3M Company (Whaley, Phillip)
July 12, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/12/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1280360 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by 3M Company (Whaley, Phillip)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 7/18/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2019 PETITION filed in State Court against 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemours Company, The, Doe Defendants 1 to 20, E.I. de Pont de Nemours and Company, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Foam, Inc. by Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Carter County District Court, case number 19-CJ-148 by 3M Company (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by 3M Company (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma v. 3MCompany et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemours Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. de Pont de Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1 to 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Phillip G. Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma
Represented By: D. Kenyon Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?