Nunley v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Lona R. Nunley
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2019cv00235
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: James H Payne
Referring Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Magistrate Judge's Availability with ORDER thereon by District Judge James H. Payne: denying consent (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE of Complaint re: Social Security Administration (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Lona R. Nunley (White, Timothy)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration - U. S. Attorney (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration - Regional Counsel (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne referring case to Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number 19-CV-235-JHP-SPS (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne: Granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis(acg, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Lona R. Nunley Responses due by 8/5/2019(White, Timothy)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 7/29/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration by Lona R. Nunley (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Lona R. Nunley (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/22/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunley v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Cheryl R. Triplett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lona R. Nunley
Represented By: Timothy M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?