McElyea v. McAlester Regional Health Center Authority
Plaintiff: Jason A. McElyea
Defendant: McAlester Regional Health Center Authority
Case Number: 6:2019cv00245
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Settlement Conference set for 5/12/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Settlement Conference Statements due 4/28/2020. (tmb, Chambers)
September 26, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by Court Clerk of Consent by the Parties to Proceed Before the United States Magistrate. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial. (With attachments)(adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting scheduling order date(s): Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 10/11/2019. Exhibit List due by 6/17/2020. Witness List due by 6/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/27/2020. Discovery due by 8/3/2020. Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 8/20/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/20/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 09:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. Jury Trial set for 9/15/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West.(adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTES of Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/26/2019. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven Max Harris on behalf of Jason A. McElyea (Harris, Steven)
September 25, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by Jason A. McElyea ; (With attachments) [NOTE: Attorney Steven Max Harris added to party Jason A. McElyea(pty:pla)]. (Harris, Steven)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 Joint STATUS REPORT by Jason A. McElyea (Harris, Steven)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - This Court acknowledges the random assignment of this case. By separate electronic mail transmission from the Clerk of this Court, the parties have been provided the Notice of Assignment to a United States Magistrate Judge With Consent to Proceed or District Judge Option form for completion and submission. If you have not received a copy of the Notice from the Clerk, a copy may be obtained on this District's website at www.oked.uscourts.gov under the tab for Forms and is titled Consent or District Judge Option Form. The parties shall submit a completed Consent/District Judge Option form by SEPTEMBER 23, 2019. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) by McAlester Regional Health Center Authority ; (With attachments)(Turner, Elaine)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Docket Entry #13 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendant's response is now due on September 11, 2019. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court) by McAlester Regional Health Center Authority Responses due by 9/18/2019(Turner, Elaine)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Brief in Support by Jason A. McElyea Responses due by 9/4/2019(Harris, Steven)
August 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting hearing(s): Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: Complaint) by McAlester Regional Health Center Authority (Turner, Elaine)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 JURY DEMAND by Jason A. McElyea (Harris, Steven)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven M. Harris on behalf of Jason A. McElyea (Harris, Steven)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Compliance with Requirements to Give Notice of Removal by McAlester Regional Health Center Authority (With attachments)(Turner, Elaine)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lindsay N. Kistler on behalf of McAlester Regional Health Center Authority (Kistler, Lindsay)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS by McAlester Regional Health Center Authority (Turner, Elaine)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elaine R. Turner on behalf of McAlester Regional Health Center Authority (Turner, Elaine)
August 1, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/1/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1285428 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by McAlester Regional Health Center Authority (Turner, Elaine)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 8/8/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Pittsburg County District Court, case number 19-CJ-142 by McAlester Regional Health Center Authority (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by McAlester Regional Health Center Authority (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2019 PETITION with Jury Demand filed in State Court against McAlester Regional Health Center Authority by Jason A. McElyea (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McElyea v. McAlester Regional Health Center Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McAlester Regional Health Center Authority
Represented By: Elaine R. Turner
Represented By: Lindsay N. Kistler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason A. McElyea
Represented By: Steven M. Harris
Represented By: Steven Max Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?