Royston v. Christian et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca Royston
Defendant: Kristi Toombs, Steve Nabors, Roy Prentice, Johnny Christian, Marie Peden, Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC, Andrew Johnson, Lisa Platfoot, Brian Fowlkes, Bonnie Murray and Dena Nations
Case Number: 6:2019cv00274
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk granting defendants' Christian, Toombs, Murray and Nations motion for extension of time to answer filed 10/04/2019 ( #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer). Accordingly, these defendants have until 11/1/2019 within which to file their answers or otherwise plead. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Johnny Christian (in his official capacity), Johnny Christian (in his individual capacity), Bonnie Murray, Dena Nations, Kristi Toombs (in her official capacity), Kristi Toombs (in her individual capacity) Responses due by 10/18/2019(Miller, Jordan)
October 4, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Wellon B. Poe on behalf of Johnny Christian(in his official capacity), Johnny Christian(in his individual capacity), Bonnie Murray, Dena Nations, Kristi Toombs(in her official capacity), Kristi Toombs(in her individual capacity) (Poe, Wellon)
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jordan L. Miller on behalf of Johnny Christian(in his official capacity), Johnny Christian(in his individual capacity), Bonnie Murray, Dena Nations, Kristi Toombs(in her official capacity), Kristi Toombs(in her individual capacity) (Miller, Jordan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Steve Nabors (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Brian Fowlkes (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Andrew Johnson (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Marie Peden (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Dena Nations (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Bonnie Murray (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Roy Prentice (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Kristi Toombs(in her individual capacity) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Kristi Toombs(in her official capacity) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Lisa Platfoot (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Johnny Christian(in his individual capacity) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Johnny Christian(in his official capacity) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 26, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/26/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1293786 (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Rebecca Royston (Bryan, J.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven J. Terrill on behalf of Rebecca Royston (Terrill, Steven)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov (Filing Fee due by 8/26/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Johnny Christian (in his official capacity), Johnny Christian (in his individual capacity), Brian Fowlkes, Andrew Johnson, Bonnie Murray, Steve Nabors, Dena Nations, Marie Peden, Lisa Platfoot, Roy Prentice, Kristi Toombs (in her official capacity), Kristi Toombs (in her individual capacity), Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC by Rebecca Royston (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Rebecca Royston (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royston v. Christian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Toombs
Represented By: Jordan L. Miller
Represented By: Wellon B. Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Nabors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Prentice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Christian
Represented By: Jordan L. Miller
Represented By: Wellon B. Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Peden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Platfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Fowlkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Murray
Represented By: Jordan L. Miller
Represented By: Wellon B. Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dena Nations
Represented By: Jordan L. Miller
Represented By: Wellon B. Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Royston
Represented By: J. Spencer Bryan
Represented By: Steven J. Terrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?