LSF8 Master Participation Trust v. Marusak
Plaintiff: LSF8 Master Participation Trust
Appellant: Ronald E. Marusak
Trustee: William Mark Bonney
Case Number: 6:2019cv00277
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Docketing Complete Record for Notice on Appeal (Re: #1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court )(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Certification of RECORD ON APPEAL and of Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (Re: #1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court ) (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Docketing Bankruptcy Partial Record on Appeal (Re: #1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court )(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Certification of PARTIAL RECORD ON APPEAL and of Transmission of Partial Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (Re: #1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court ) (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Re: #1 Notice of Appeal) (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/22/2019) (jcb, Deputy Clerk).
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal in District Court (Re: #1 Notice of Appeal) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election to District Court (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/22/2019) (jcb, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LSF8 Master Participation Trust v. Marusak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ronald E. Marusak
Represented By: James S. Matthews, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LSF8 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Melissa Sue Hayward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: William Mark Bonney
Represented By: William Mark Bonney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?