Seminole, City of v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Plaintiff: Seminole, City of
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Anda, Inc., Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Allergan, PLC, Purdue Frederick Company, The, Keysource Medical, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis, PLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Watson Pharmaceutical, Inc., Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Perry Fine, McKesson Corp., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP, Watson Pharma, Inc., Physicians Total Care, Inc., GCP Pharma, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. and Lynn Webster
Case Number: 6:2019cv00291
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #32 MOTION to Remand ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ;(Zschiesche, Ray)
October 15, 2019 Filing 43 Joint RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #33 MOTION to Expedite Ruling ) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. ;(Campbell, Stuart)
October 15, 2019 Filing 42 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. (With attachments) Responses due by 10/29/2019(Campbell, Stuart)
October 15, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #32 MOTION to Remand ) by McKesson Corp. ; (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart)
October 2, 2019 Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-291-TDD. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2019 Filing 39 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey A. Curran on behalf of Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Curran, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2019 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 10/15/2019(Quinn, Ashley)
October 1, 2019 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD for Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc.) by Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Quinn, Ashley)
October 1, 2019 Filing 36 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ashley E. Quinn on behalf of Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc. (Quinn, Ashley)
October 1, 2019 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying Corporates Parents Cupric Holding Co., Inc. and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. for Cephalon, Inc.; Corporate Parents Orvet UK Unlimited, Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V. and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Other Affiliates Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperatieve U.A. and IVAX LLC for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, and Watson Laboratories, Inc.) by Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (McCampbell, Robert) Modified on 10/2/2019: added corporate parents, other affiliates and edited text (nm, Deputy Clerk).
October 1, 2019 Filing 34 SPECIAL APPEARANCE by Robert G. McCampbell on behalf of Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (McCampbell, Robert) Modified on 10/1/2019 to delete filer (dma, Deputy Clerk).
September 30, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Expedite Ruling (Re: #32 MOTION to Remand ) by Seminole, City of (With attachments) Responses due by 10/15/2019(Court, Todd)
September 30, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Remand by Seminole, City of (With attachments) [NOTE: Attorney Todd A. Court added to party Seminole, City of(pty:pla)]. Responses due by 10/15/2019(Court, Todd)
September 30, 2019 Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - The Clerk's Office is in receipt of a District Judge Option for this case. Therefore, Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West is no longer assigned to this case and the Clerk awaits reassignment of this case to a District Judge. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record filed by Sanford C. Coats (Docket Entry #29 ) is hereby GRANTED. Since alternative counsel has entered the case for the Purdue Pharma Defendants, Mr. Coats is permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for these Defendants.(adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Sanford C. Coats by Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP Responses due by 10/8/2019(Coats, Sanford)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2019 Filing 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Evan Way on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP (Way, Evan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Bankruptcy as to Purdue Pharma L.P. and Purdue Pharma Inc. by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP (With attachments)(Burns, Joshua)
September 17, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joshua D. Burns on behalf of Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP (Burns, Joshua)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of Judge Ronald A. White, this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-291-KEW. (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 9/24/2019(Riddles, D.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Riddles, D.)
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, McKesson Corp. Responses due by 9/23/2019(Campbell, Stuart)
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Corporate Parent Generic Drug Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent HDG Acquisition, Inc., Corporate Parent Cardinal Health, Inc. for Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The) by Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The (Ray, Ryan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The (Ray, Ryan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A. Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 9/19/2019(Zschiesche, Ray)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL Notice of Removal (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) by McKesson Corp. (With attachments)(Campbell, Stuart)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stuart D. Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by D. Michael McBride, III on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation) by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan E. Huntsman on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
August 30, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/30/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1295400 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Endo International PLC for Endo Health Solutions, Inc.) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ray E. Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Zschiesche, Ray)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. ( Filing Fee due by 9/6/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Seminole County District Court, case number CJ-2019-067 by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Actavis, PLC, Allergan, PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Perry Fine, GCP Pharma, LLC, Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Keysource Medical, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corp., Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Physicians Total Care, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, The, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP, Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceutical, Inc., Lynn Webster by Seminole, City of (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seminole, City of v. Purdue Pharma, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ray E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley E. Quinn
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Represented By: Evan Way
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, The
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Represented By: Evan Way
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Ray E. Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: D. Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The
Represented By: Ryan A. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Robert A. Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp.
Represented By: Kaylee Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: D. Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E. Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, LP
Represented By: Sanford C. Coats
Represented By: Evan Way
Represented By: Joshua D. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Robert A. Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seminole, City of
Represented By: Tony G. Puckett
Represented By: Todd A. Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?