George's Colliers, Inc. et al v. ICL America Limited
Plaintiff: George's Collier's, Inc., Crakol Energy, LLC, South Central Coal Company, Inc. and George's Colliers, Inc.
Defendant: ICL America Limited
Case Number: 6:2019cv00293
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Counterclaim (Re: #15 Counterclaim) by South Central Coal Company, Inc. (Bonner, L.)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White : In light of the Amended Complaint filed 9/16/2019, Defendant's Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support or, alternatively, Rule 12(E) Motion for More Definite Statement filed 9/10/2019 ( #9 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim ; #9 Motion for More Definite Statement) is hereby deemed as MOOT. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against South Central Coal Company, Inc. by ICL America Limited (Neal, Lane)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Amended Complaint (Re: #12 Amended Complaint) by ICL America Limited (Neal, Lane)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively, MOTION for More Definite Statement) by Crakol Energy, LLC, George's Colliers, Inc., South Central Coal Company, Inc. (Bonner, L.)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ICL America Limited (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by South Central Coal Company, Inc., George's Colliers, Inc., Crakol Energy, LLC (Bonner, L.)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White inviting Plaintiffs, if they so desire, to file an Amended Complaint by 9/20/2019, providing additional factual averments which may vitiate Defendant's claims of insufficiency. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Emmanuel E. Edem on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Edem, Emmanuel)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively, Rule 12(E) MOTION for More Definite Statement by ICL America Limited Responses due by 9/24/2019(Neal, Lane). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 9/13/2019 (dma, Deputy Clerk).
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 JURY DEMAND by Crakol Energy, LLC, George's Colliers, Inc., South Central Coal Company, Inc. (Bonner, L.)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by L. Mark Bonner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bonner, L.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 JURY DEMAND by ICL America Limited (Neal, Lane)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ICL America Limited (Neal, Lane) Modified on 9/5/2019: deleted corporate parent ICL America Limited (nm, Deputy Clerk).
September 4, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/4/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1296302 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by ICL America Limited (Neal, Lane)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lane R. Neal on behalf of ICL America Limited (Neal, Lane)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 9/10/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from LeFlore County District Court, case number CJ-2019-141 by ICL America Limited (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by ICL America Limited (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against ICL America Limited by South Central Coal Company, Inc., George's Collier's, Inc., Crakol Energy, LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George's Colliers, Inc. et al v. ICL America Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George's Collier's, Inc.
Represented By: L. Mark Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crakol Energy, LLC
Represented By: L. Mark Bonner
Represented By: Emmanuel E. Edem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Central Coal Company, Inc.
Represented By: L. Mark Bonner
Represented By: Emmanuel E. Edem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George's Colliers, Inc.
Represented By: L. Mark Bonner
Represented By: Emmanuel E. Edem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICL America Limited
Represented By: Lane R. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?