Tucker v. United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Plaintiff: Markeith D. Tucker
Defendant: United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma, Carmelita Reeder Shinn and Timothy D. DeGiusti
Case Number: 6:2019cv00295
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis ( #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis) and dismissing case with prejudice (case terminated) (lal, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Markeith D. Tucker (With attachments) Responses due by 11/1/2019(lal, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing plaintiff to supplement his motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ) no later than 10/7/2019(lal, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Markeith D. Tucker (With attachments) Responses due by 9/18/2019(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma, Carmelita Reeder Shinn and Timothy D. DeGiusti by Markeith D. Tucker (jcb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/10/2019 to add parties (dma, Deputy Clerk).
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Markeith D. Tucker (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markeith D. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmelita Reeder Shinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy D. DeGiusti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?