Stark Ranch-West, LLC v. Redi-Mix, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stark Ranch-West, LLC
Defendant: Redi-Mix, LLC, United Way, Frost Bank, North Central Texas College and Oklahoma Christian University
Case Number: 6:2019cv00305
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, defendants Oklahoma Christian University, North Central Texas College, United Way of Cooke County, and Frost Bank have until 11/15/2019 to file their answer or otherwise plead. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Frost Bank, North Central Texas College, Oklahoma Christian University, United Way Responses due by 10/29/2019(Shephard, C.)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, defendants Oklahoma Christian University, North Central Texas College, United Way, and Frost Bank have until 10/16/2019 to file their answer(s) or otherwise plead. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Frost Bank, North Central Texas College, Oklahoma Christian University, United Way Responses due by 9/30/2019(Shephard, C.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kane Cassil on behalf of Frost Bank, North Central Texas College, Oklahoma Christian University, United Way (Cassil, Kane)
September 10, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/10/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1297988 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Oklahoma Christian University (Shephard, C.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by C. Eric Shephard on behalf of Frost Bank, North Central Texas College, Oklahoma Christian University, United Way (Shephard, C.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 9/17/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Love County District Court, case number CJ-2019-29 by Frost Bank, North Central Texas College, Oklahoma Christian University, United Way (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Frost Bank, North Central Texas College, Oklahoma Christian University, United Way (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Frost Bank, North Central Texas College, Oklahoma Christian University, Redi-Mix, LLC, United Way by Stark Ranch-West, LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stark Ranch-West, LLC v. Redi-Mix, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redi-Mix, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Way
Represented By: Kane Cassil
Represented By: C. Eric Shephard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frost Bank
Represented By: Kane Cassil
Represented By: C. Eric Shephard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Central Texas College
Represented By: Kane Cassil
Represented By: C. Eric Shephard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Christian University
Represented By: Kane Cassil
Represented By: C. Eric Shephard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stark Ranch-West, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth L. Delashaw, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?