Knox v. Sharp
Petitioner: Antone Lamandingo Knox
Respondent: Tommy Sharp
Case Number: 6:2019cv00307
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Office: Muskogee Office
Presiding Judge: James H Payne
Referring Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne : Denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Initial Filing Fee due by 9/30/2019 in the amount of $5.00. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne, referring case to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-19-307-JHP-KEW. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Oklahoma Western
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #8 Any purported "objections" are therefore DENIED. Doc. no. 9. The Report and Recommendation #8 is ACCEPTED and AFFIRMED As recommended by the magistrate judge, this 2241 matter, including petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 , is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma.Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 9/10/2019. (ac) [Transferred from okwd on 9/10/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #8 filed by Antone Lamandingo Knox. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ac) [Transferred from okwd on 9/10/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Antone Lamandingo Knox, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Antone Lamandingo Knox. The undersigned recommends that the interest of justice warrants the transfer of this matter to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma. Objections to R&R due by 9/19/2019. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues and terminates the referral to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 8/29/19. (lb) [Transferred from okwd on 9/10/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 08/28/19. (nv) [Transferred from okwd on 9/10/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Stephen P. Friot for all further proceedings. Honorable Joe Heaton no longer assigned to case Entered at the direction of the Honorable Joe Heaton on 08/28/19. (nv) [Transferred from okwd on 9/10/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 PREVIOUS Cases. (nv) [Transferred from okwd on 9/10/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Antone Lamandingo Knox (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) [Transferred from okwd on 9/10/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Antone Lamandingo Knox. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) [Transferred from okwd on 9/10/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antone Lamandingo Knox. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) [Transferred from okwd on 9/10/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Antone Lamandingo Knox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Approved Achievement Credits Program Participation Points, #2 Exhibit B - 57 O.S. Sect. 115-Reentry Program for Offenders, #3 Exhibit C - ODOC Custody Assessment Scale, #4 Exhibit - Offense Severity Categories, #5 Exhibit-Requests to Staff, #6 Exhibit-ODOC Time Sheet, #7 Exhibit-Letter from ODOC to Antion Knox dated 08.12.19, #8 Envelope)(nv) [Transferred from okwd on 9/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knox v. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tommy Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antone Lamandingo Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?