Oklahoma Natural Grass v. One Gas, Inc.
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Natural Grass
Defendant: One Gas, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Emerald Cross, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00313
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 ***Remark: Email notification of disposition of case to Patent & Trademark Office. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE by District Judge John E. Dowdell granting #16 Joint Motion to Administratively Close. (case terminated) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 23, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Administratively Close by One Gas, Inc. Responses due by 11/6/2019(Nelson, Todd)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John E. Dowdell: Granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion; Responses are due by 10/28/2019. (Re: #10 MOTION to Remand and in the Alternative MOTION to Dismiss) In light of Dkt. #13 Minute Order which strikes the Scheduling Conference, #12 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference is deemed moot. (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of Judge Ronald A. White and at the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge John E. Dowdell of the Northern District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-313-JED. (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-313-RAW. The Scheduling Conference set 10/18/2019 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge Steven P. Shreder is hereby STRICKEN. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion and MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference (Re: #10 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Dismiss) by One Gas, Inc. Responses due by 10/29/2019(Nelson, Todd). Added MOTION on 10/17/2019 (cjt, Deputy Clerk).
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT by One Gas, Inc. (Nelson, Todd)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand and in Alternative MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims by Oklahoma Natural Grass (With attachments) Responses due by 10/18/2019 (White, Edward). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 10/8/2019 (dma, Deputy Clerk).
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 10/18/2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to file Joint Status Report by 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form) (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey A. Curran on behalf of One Gas, Inc. (Curran, Jeffrey)
September 18, 2019 ***Remark: Email notification of initiating event to Patent & Trademark Office. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/13/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1299592 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by One Gas, Inc. (Nelson, Todd)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by One Gas, Inc. (Nelson, Todd)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Oklahoma Natural Grass by One Gas, Inc. (Nelson, Todd)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by One Gas, Inc. (Nelson, Todd)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Todd A. Nelson on behalf of One Gas, Inc. (Nelson, Todd)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 9/20/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Muskogee County District Court, case number CJ-19-390 by One Gas, Inc. (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by One Gas, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against One Gas, Inc. by Oklahoma Natural Grass (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oklahoma Natural Grass v. One Gas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Natural Grass
Represented By: Edward L. White
Represented By: Dwight D.D. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Gas, Inc.
Represented By: W. A. Edmondson
Represented By: Todd A. Nelson
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Emerald Cross, LLC
Represented By: Edward L. White
Represented By: Dwight D.D. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?