Webb v. Cotton et al
Plaintiff: Christopher John Webb
Defendant: Tammy Cotton, Micky J. Hadwigger, Mark Keller, Oklahoma Department of Human Services, Leonard Gouge and Brian Mitchell
Case Number: 6:2019cv00330
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Micky J. Hadwigger, Brian Mitchell (Asst. District Attorney, in his individual capacity and official capacity) Responses due by 12/5/2019(Lawson, Stefanie)
November 21, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stefanie E. Lawson on behalf of Micky J. Hadwigger, Brian Mitchell(Asst. District Attorney, in his individual capacity), Brian Mitchell(Asst. District Attorney, in his official capacity) (Lawson, Stefanie)
November 20, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tracy E. Neel on behalf of Oklahoma Department of Human Services (Neel, Tracy)
November 19, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Micky J. Hadwigger - Served via USMS on 11/1/2019. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted via USMS re: Tammy Cotton (lal, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Oklahoma Department of Human Services - Served via USMS on 10/31/2019. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted via USMS re: Mark Keller (lal, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by Oklahoma Department of Human Services Responses due by 12/3/2019(Weitman, M.)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by M. Daniel Weitman on behalf of Oklahoma Department of Human Services (Weitman, M.)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Brian Mitchell(Asst. District Attorney, in his individual capacity and official capacity) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: #6 Amended Complaint ) by Christopher John Webb (With attachments)(lal, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Leonard Gouge (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Micky J. Hadwigger (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Mark Keller (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Oklahoma Department of Human Services (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Tammy Cotton (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White, directing the Clerk of Court to issue Civil Summons for the named defendant(s) and to forward the issued Summons to the U.S. Marshal for service. The plaintiff has been granted In Forma Pauperis status.(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tammy Cotton, Leonard Gouge, Micky J. Hadwigger, Mark Keller, Oklahoma Department of Human Services (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Christopher John Webb (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER to Plaintiff with 285 forms(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis(tls, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Christopher John Webb Responses due by 10/15/2019(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Tammy Cotton, Leonard Gouge, Micky J. Hadwigger, Mark Keller, Oklahoma Department of Human Services by Christopher John Webb (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Christopher John Webb (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Cotton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micky J. Hadwigger
Represented By: Stefanie E. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Department of Human Services
Represented By: Tracy E. Neel
Represented By: M. Daniel Weitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Gouge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Mitchell
Represented By: Stefanie E. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher John Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?