Cherry v. C.V.'s Foodliner, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: April Cherry
Defendant: C.V.'s Foodliner, Inc. and John Doe
Case Number: 6:2019cv00337
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C.V.'s Foodliner, Inc. (Pratt, Alexandra) Modified on 10/30/2019 to delete corporate parent (dma, Deputy Clerk).
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alexandra E. Pratt on behalf of C.V.'s Foodliner, Inc. (Pratt, Alexandra)
October 7, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 10/7/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1306927 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by C.V.'s Foodliner, Inc. (Carter, Brian)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by C.V.'s Foodliner, Inc. (Carter, Brian)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brian L. Carter on behalf of C.V.'s Foodliner, Inc. (Carter, Brian)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk,. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 10/15/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Sequoyah County District Court, case number CJ-19-153 by C.V.'s Foodliner, Inc. (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by C.V.'s Foodliner, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against C.V.'s Foodliner, Inc., John Doe by April Cherry (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cherry v. C.V.'s Foodliner, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.V.'s Foodliner, Inc.
Represented By: Brian L. Carter
Represented By: Alexandra E. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Cherry
Represented By: John L. Branum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?