Gray v. Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Gray
Defendant: Rolling Hills Hospital, LLC and Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00338
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 31 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the New Mexico
October 1, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson GRANTING #8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue. Clerk of Court is Ordered to transfer case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma. (mag) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Deborah Gray re #19 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Remand to State Court filed by Deborah Gray (Hart, F) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Remand to State Court filed by Deborah Gray. (Hart, F) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 27 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Scheduling Conference held on 6/18/2019. (kfg) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY ENTERING SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause to delay entering a scheduling order at this time pending decisions on #8 Motion to Dismiss and #19 Motion for Leave to File. (kfg) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Remand to State Court filed by Rolling Hills Hospital, LLC. (LeBlanc, Thomas) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Remand to State Court filed by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc.. (Clement, Ryan) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. of Certificate of Service Initial Disclosures (Clement, Ryan) Modified text on 6/14/2019 (meq). [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deborah Gray Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Hart, F) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 21 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. (Clement, Ryan) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Rolling Hills Hospital, LLC. (LeBlanc, Thomas) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Remand to State Court by Deborah Gray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hart, F) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. of Filing State Court Records (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition to Appoint Guardian ad Litem, #2 Exhibit Complaint for Personal Injuries, #3 Exhibit Jury Demand 12 Persons, #4 Exhibit Notice of Peremptory Excusal, #5 Exhibit Summons on Complaint - Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., #6 Exhibit Summons on Complaint - Rolling Hills Hospital, LLC, #7 Exhibit Notice of Judge Assignment, #8 Exhibit Service of Process Transmittal - Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., #9 Exhibit Service of Process Transmittal - Rolling Hills Hospital, LLC, #10 Exhibit Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem, #11 Exhibit Certificate of Service on Return of Service on Acadia Healthcare Commpany, Inc., #12 Exhibit Certificate of Service on Return of Service on Rolling Hills Hospital, LLC, #13 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Joint Notice of Removal) (Clement, Ryan) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Deborah Gray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Response to MTD) (Conaway, Joshua) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 15 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Rule 16 Hearing set for 6/18/2019 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 6/10/2019. (kfg) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cda)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. (Clement, Ryan) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan L Clement on behalf of Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. (Clement, Ryan) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 Acadia's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Personal Injury by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc.. (Clement, Ryan) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue by Rolling Hills Hospital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Robert Turner) (LeBlanc, Thomas) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 "FILED IN ERROR" DUPLICATE OF DOC. 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Rolling Hills Hospital, LLC by Carrie McNeer (Association Dues - Online Payment) (McNeer, Carrie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified text pursuant to call received on helpdesk on 5/7/2019 (bap). [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., Rolling Hills Hospital, LLC re 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, of filing Certificates of Good Standing (Clement, Ryan) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6418782 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Rolling Hills Hospital, LLC, Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Clement, Ryan)[Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6418745 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Rolling Hills Hospital, LLC, Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Clement, Ryan)[Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., Rolling Hills Hospital, LLC by Ryan L Clement on behalf of: Carrie B. McNeer Best & Sharp 1 West 3rd Street, Suite 900Tulsa, Oklahoma 74103 918-732-0135 Fax 918-585-9447 cmcneer@bestsharp.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Clement, Ryan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc., Rolling Hills Hospital, LLC by Ryan L Clement on behalf of: Thomas A. LeBlanc Best & Sharp 1 West 3rd Street, Suite 900Tulsa, Oklahoma 74103 918-732-0111 Fax 918-585-9447 TLeBlanc@bestsharp.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Clement, Ryan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 2, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6413280 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Clement, Ryan) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. from First Judicial District Court, case number D-117-CV-2019-00134. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Clement, Ryan) [Transferred from nmd on 10/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolling Hills Hospital, LLC
Represented By: Ryan L Clement
Represented By: Thomas A. LeBlanc
Represented By: Carrie B. McNeer
Represented By: Melanie Frassanito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acadia Healthcare Company, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan L Clement
Represented By: Thomas A. LeBlanc
Represented By: Carrie B. McNeer
Represented By: Melanie Frassanito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Gray
Represented By: Kelly A. Stout Sanchez
Represented By: F Michael Hart
Represented By: Joshua K Conaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?