Hershey v. Turner et al
Plaintiff: Richard Hershey
Defendant: Christine Landsaw, Sgt. James Mynatt, James Mynatt, Amanda Craig, Deborah Landry, Ben Hardcastle, Kirsti Wilmon, Jerrid Freeman, Jimmie Robertson, Steve Turner and Jacki Adair-Smith
Case Number: 6:2019cv00344
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jacki Adair-Smith(Acting as coordinator, conferences and events of Northeastern State University and in her individual capacity) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Amanda Craig(in her individual capacity and Acting as police officer of Northeastern State University) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jimmie Robertson(Acting as police officer of Northeastern State University and in his individual capacity) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to James Mynatt(Sgt., in his individual capacity and Acting as Police Officer of Northeastern State University) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Kirsti Wilmon(acting as Assistant Director for Conferences and Marketing of Northeastern State University and in her individual capacity ) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Christine Landsaw (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Deborah Landry (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Ben Hardcastle (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jerrid Freeman (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Steve Turner (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bryon E. Hale on behalf of Richard Hershey (Hale, Bryon)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder GRANTING #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Bryon E. Hale for Plaintiff, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Bryon E. Hale to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1312873) by Richard Hershey (With attachments) Responses due by 11/12/2019(Williams, Justin)
October 21, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 10/21/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 17355 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Richard Hershey (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 10/22/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jacki Adair-Smith(in her individual capacity and Acting as coordinator, conferences and events of Northeastern State University), Amanda Craig(in her individual capacity and as Acting as police officer of Northeastern State University), Jerrid Freeman, Ben Hardcastle, Deborah Landry, Christine Landsaw, James Mynatt(Sgt., in his individual capacity and Acting as Police Officer of Northeastern State University), Jimmie Robertson(in his individual capacity and Acting as police officer of Northeastern State University) Steve Turner by Richard Hershey (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Richard Hershey (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hershey v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Landsaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. James Mynatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mynatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Hardcastle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirsti Wilmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerrid Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmie Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacki Adair-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hershey
Represented By: Bryon E. Hale
Represented By: Justin R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?