Brooks-Gage v. Oklahoma State of
Petitioner: Scotty Ladell Brooks-Gage
Respondent: Oklahoma, State of
Case Number: 6:2019cv00347
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Office: Muskogee Office
Presiding Judge: James H Payne
Referring Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Before transferring this action to the Eastern District of Oklahoma, the District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma construed Petitioner's "certificate motion to 'appeal under COA' move demanding to appeal a subsequent application for post-conviction relief" #1 as a petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2254, challenging his conviction in Pontotoc County District Court Case No. CF-2006-433 #4 . Petitioner, therefore, is directed to complete and return within fourteen (14) days this Courts form for filing a habeas corpus petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254. The Court Clerk is directed to send Petitioner the proper form for filing a 2254 petition in this Court. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Upon review of the file in this case, the Court finds that the petitioner has not submitted a proper motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or paid the $5.00 filing fee. The petitioner is directed to submit a properly executed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with original signature and have the Trust Fund Officer at his/her facility complete (with an original signature) the Required Certification (Page 3) and provide a current 6-month financial accounting statement and return the completed motion to the Office of the Clerk or pay the filing fee of $5.00 within 20 days or by 10/3/19. The Clerk is directed to provide the plaintiff with a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis form and an instruction sheet.(acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne, referring case to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-19-347-JHP-KEW. (acg, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Oklahoma Western
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for #4 Report and Recommendation. the Court finds that this action should be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma for all further proceedings pursuant to USC 28:1404(a).. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/17/19. (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 10/17/2019.]
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Scotty Ladell Brooks-Gage. The undersigned recommends the transfer of this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma for all further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 10/3/2019. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues and terminates the referral to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 9/12/19. (lb) [Transferred from okwd on 10/17/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Enter Order Referring Case, to: Scotty Ladell Brooks-Gage #408036 CUSHING-CCF 3200 S Kings Hwy Cushing, OK 74023-5337 (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 10/17/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Signed by the direction of Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/11/19. (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 10/17/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NO PREVIOUS Cases (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 10/17/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Scotty Ladell Brooks-Gage. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - State Court Documents, #2 Envelope)(kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 10/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks-Gage v. Oklahoma State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scotty Ladell Brooks-Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Oklahoma, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?