Cummings v. American Postal Worker's Union - AFL-CIO
Plaintiff: Mary F. Cummings
Defendant: American Postal Worker's Union - AFL-CIO
Case Number: 6:2019cv00367
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White STRIKING Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Motion filed 12/18/2019 (Re: #13 Surreply to Motion ) for the reason no sur-reply is allowed to be filed of record without leave of court. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 SURREPLY to Motion (entitled: Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss) by Mary F. Cummings (With attachments) (cjt, Deputy Clerk) ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN by Court per Minute Order 14 entered 12/18/2019*** (lal, Deputy Clerk).
December 3, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim) by American Postal Worker's Union - AFL-CIO (With attachments)(Hickman, Steven) Modified on 12/4/2019 to edit event and text (dma, Deputy Clerk).
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss) by Mary F. Cummings (With attachments) (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joni Suzan Jacobs on behalf of American Postal Worker's Union - AFL-CIO (Jacobs, Joni)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White inviting plaintiff, if so desired to file an amended complaint by 11/18/2019 providing additional factual averments which may vitiate Defendants' claims of insufficiency (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Joni Suzan Jacobs for American Postal Worker's Union - AFL-CIO, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Joni S. Jacobs to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1314683) by American Postal Worker's Union - AFL-CIO (With attachments) Responses due by 11/19/2019(Hickman, Steven)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by American Postal Worker's Union - AFL-CIO Responses due by 11/19/2019(Hickman, Steven)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Frank W. Frasier on behalf of American Postal Worker's Union - AFL-CIO (Frasier, Frank)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven R. Hickman on behalf of American Postal Worker's Union - AFL-CIO (Hickman, Steven)
October 31, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 10/31/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1313737 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by American Postal Worker's Union - AFL-CIO (Hickman, Steven)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 11/7/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Sequoyah County District Court, case number CJ-2019-180 by American Postal Worker's Union - AFL-CIO (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by American Postal Worker's Union - AFL-CIO (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against American Postal Worker's Union - AFL-CIO by Mary F. Cummings (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cummings v. American Postal Worker's Union - AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Postal Worker's Union - AFL-CIO
Represented By: Steven R. Hickman
Represented By: Frank W. Frasier
Represented By: Joni Suzan Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary F. Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?