United States of America v. Moore et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: W. A. Moore, JR, Donna Lavoy Moore, Lavoy Moore, Dub Moore, Patsy Ruth Moore, Laura Lee Karlik and W. A. Moore, Jr.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00369
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:3301
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing parties to file a Joint Status Report by 1/10/2020 (dma, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Laura Lee Karlik, Donna Lavoy Moore, Patsy Ruth Moore and W. A. Moore, Jr.'s answers are due 1/10/2020 (dma, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2019 Filing 18 Second Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint) by W. A. Moore, Jr(Individually), W. A. Moore, Jr(as Trustees of the W.A. Moore, Jr., and Patsy Ruth Moore Trust) Responses due by 12/31/2019(Bickford, Warren)
December 16, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Eddie Foraker on behalf of Patsy Ruth Moore(Individually) (Foraker, Eddie)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Laura Lee Karlik, Donna Lavoy Moore, Patsy Ruth Moore and W. A. Moore, Jr.'s answers due 12/19/2019 (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Peter L. Scimeca on behalf of W. A. Moore, Jr(Individually) and as Trustee of the W.A. Moore, Jr. and Patsy Ruth Moore Trust (Scimeca, Peter) Modified on 11/26/2019 to add filer (dma, Deputy Clerk).
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint) by W. A. Moore, Jr(Individually) and as Trustee of the W.A. Moore, Jr. and Patsy Ruth Moore Trust; Responses due by 12/9/2019(Bickford, Warren) Modified on 11/26/2019 to add filer (dma, Deputy Clerk).
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Warren F. Bickford, IV on behalf of W. A. Moore, Jr(Individually) and as Trustee of the W.A. Moore, Jr. and Patsy Ruth Moore Trust (Bickford, Warren) Modified on 11/26/2019 to add filer (dma, Deputy Clerk).
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brecken A. Wagner on behalf of Laura Lee Karlik, Donna Lavoy Moore (Wagner, Brecken)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Donna Lavoy Moore - Served on 11/7/2019. by United States of America (Compton, Clay)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Patsy Ruth Moore(Individually) - Served on 11/7/2019; Patsy Ruth Moore(as Trustee of the W.A. Moore, Jr., and Patsy Ruth Moore Trust) - Served on 11/7/2019. by United States of America (Compton, Clay)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: W. A. Moore, Jr(Individually) - Served on 11/7/2019; W. A. Moore, Jr(as Trustees of the W.A. Moore, Jr., and Patsy Ruth Moore Trust) - Served on 11/7/2019. by United States of America (Compton, Clay)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Susan S. Brandon on behalf of United States of America (Brandon, Susan)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Laura Lee Karlik (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Donna Lavoy Moore (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Patsy Ruth Moore(Individually and as Trustee of the W.A. Moore, Jr., and Patsy Ruth Moore Trust) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to W. A. Moore, Jr.(Individually and as Trustee of the W.A. Moore, Jr., and Patsy Ruth Moore Trust) (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Laura Lee Karlik, Donna Lavoy Moore, Patsy Ruth Moore(Individually and as Trustee of the W.A. Moore, Jr., and Patsy Ruth Moore Trust), W. A. Moore, Jr (Individually and as Trustees of the W.A. Moore, Jr., and Patsy Ruth Moore Trust) by United States of America (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2019: #20 Exhibit 20 - Edward Jones Statement, #21 Exhibit 22 - Judgment) (jcb, Deputy Clerk).
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. A. Moore, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Lavoy Moore
Represented By: Brecken A. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lavoy Moore
Represented By: Brecken A. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dub Moore
Represented By: Warren F. Bickford, IV
Represented By: Peter L. Scimeca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patsy Ruth Moore
Represented By: Eddie Foraker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Lee Karlik
Represented By: Brecken A. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. A. Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Warren F. Bickford, IV
Represented By: Peter L. Scimeca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Clay A. Compton
Represented By: Susan S. Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?