Bartee v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Valerie Annette Bartee
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2019cv00371
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: James H Payne
Referring Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #9 Certificate of Electronic Service (Social Security) ) by Valerie Annette Bartee (Troutman, Gayle)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE of Complaint re: Social Security Administration Commissioner & US Attorney (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint) by Valerie Annette Bartee (Troutman, Gayle)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration - U.S. Attorney (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration - Regional Counsel (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne referring case to Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number 19-CV-371-JHP-SPS (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Darren T. Rackley on behalf of Valerie Annette Bartee (Rackley, Darren)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gayle L. Troutman on behalf of Valerie Annette Bartee (Troutman, Gayle)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 11/12/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration by Valerie Annette Bartee (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Valerie Annette Bartee (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 11/5/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1314722 (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Valerie Annette Bartee (Troutman, Gayle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartee v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Annette Bartee
Represented By: Gayle L. Troutman
Represented By: Darren T. Rackley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?