AT&T Corp. v. C.D. Brown Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: AT&T Corp.
Defendant: C.D. Brown Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00378
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Max Deane on behalf of C.D. Brown Construction, Inc. (Deane, Max)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by C.D. Brown Construction, Inc. (Secrest, James)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James K. Secrest, III on behalf of C.D. Brown Construction, Inc. (Secrest, James)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: C.D. Brown Construction, Inc. - Served on 12/5/2019. by AT&T Corp. (Stephens, Hayley)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk : Pursuant to the recusal of Judge Ronald A. White and at the direction of the Court, this case is hereby randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-378-KEW.(lal, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to C.D. Brown Construction, Inc. (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent AT&T, Inc. for AT&T Corp.) by AT&T Corp. (Stephens, Hayley)
November 7, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 11/7/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1315527 (Re: #2 Complaint) by AT&T Corp. (sms, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. ( Filing Fee due by 11/14/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against C.D. Brown Construction, Inc. by AT&T Corp. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by AT&T Corp. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AT&T Corp. v. C.D. Brown Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Corp.
Represented By: Hayley N. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.D. Brown Construction, Inc.
Represented By: James K. Secrest, III
Represented By: Max Deane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?