Dixon v. Regional University System of the Oklahoma Board of Regents
Plaintiff: Marci D. Walkingstick Dixon
Defendant: Regional University System of the Oklahoma Board of Regents
Case Number: 6:2019cv00391
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Regional University System of the Oklahoma Board of Regents - Served on 11/20/2019. by Marci D. Walkingstick Dixon (Hammons, Mark)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brandon Douglas Roberts on behalf of Marci D. Walkingstick Dixon (Roberts, Brandon)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amber L. Hurst on behalf of Marci D. Walkingstick Dixon (Hurst, Amber)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Regional University System of the Oklahoma Board of Regents (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Hammons on behalf of Marci D. Walkingstick Dixon (Hammons, Mark)
November 18, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 11/18/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1318267 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Marci D. Walkingstick Dixon (Hammons, Mark)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 11/25/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Regional University System of the Oklahoma Board of Regents by Marci D. Walkingstick Dixon (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Marci D. Walkingstick Dixon (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Regional University System of the Oklahoma Board of Regents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marci D. Walkingstick Dixon
Represented By: Mark Hammons
Represented By: Brandon Douglas Roberts
Represented By: Amber L. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional University System of the Oklahoma Board of Regents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?