Farhat et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Kaylee Walden, Kimberly Diane Page, Christina Ann Farhat and Melissa Hill
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 6:2019cv00401
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: United States of America - Served U.S. Attorney General on 12/17/2019 by Kimberly Diane Page; Kaylee Walden(as guardian of Weston Buck Farhat); Christina Ann Farhat; Melissa Hill; Kaylee Walden(as personal representative of the estate of Physher Wyatt Farhat, deceased) (Wright, Thomas) Modified on 1/6/2020 to edit text (dma, Deputy Clerk).
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: All Defendants served on 12/12/19 by Kimberly Diane Page, Kaylee Walden(as guardian of Weston Buck Farhat), Christina Ann Farhat, Melissa Hill, Kaylee Walden(as personal representative of the estate of Physher Wyatt Farhat, deceased) (Wright, Thomas) Modified on 12/18/2019 to edit text (dma, Deputy Clerk).
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by S. Stephen Barnes on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Barnes, S.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to United States of America by serving U.S. Attorney General (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to United States of America by serving U.S. Attorney (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 11/25/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1320437 (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Christina Ann Farhat, Melissa Hill, Kimberly Diane Page, Kaylee Walden(as guardian of Weston Buck Farhat), Kaylee Walden(as personal representative of the estate of Physher Wyatt Farhat, deceased) (Wright, Thomas)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bill J. Nunn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nunn, Bill)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 12/2/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against United States of America by Kimberly Diane Page, Kaylee Walden (as guardian of Weston Buck Farhat), Christina Ann Farhat, Melissa Hill, Kaylee Walden (as personal representative of the estate of Physher Wyatt Farhat, deceased) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Christina Ann Farhat, Melissa Hill, Kimberly Diane Page, Kaylee Walden (as guardian of Weston Buck Farhat), Kaylee Walden (as personal representative of the estate of Physher Wyatt Farhat, deceased) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farhat et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaylee Walden
Represented By: Bill J. Nunn
Represented By: S. Stephen Barnes
Represented By: Thomas M. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Diane Page
Represented By: Bill J. Nunn
Represented By: S. Stephen Barnes
Represented By: Thomas M. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Ann Farhat
Represented By: Bill J. Nunn
Represented By: S. Stephen Barnes
Represented By: Thomas M. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Hill
Represented By: Bill J. Nunn
Represented By: S. Stephen Barnes
Represented By: Thomas M. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?