Burrough et al v. Changing Course Foundation et al
Plaintiff: Steven Burrough, Rosalind G. Sorrell and Steven P. Burrough
Defendant: Kim Hale and Murray County Board of County Commissioners
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Changing Course Foundation
3Rd Party Defendant: Air Donkey LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00402
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Changing Course Foundation (Agee, Brett)
December 24, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ron Wright on behalf of Air Donkey LLC (Wright, Ron)
December 24, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Air Donkey LLC (Wright, Ron)
December 24, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint (Re: #8 Third Party Complaint) by Air Donkey LLC [NOTE: Attorney Ron Wright added to party Air Donkey LLC(pty:3pd)]. (Wright, Ron)
December 24, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Counterclaim (Re: #7 Counterclaim) by Steven P. Burrough, Rosalind G. Sorrell (Wright, Ron)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Air Donkey LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Air Donkey LLC by Changing Course Foundation (With attachments)(Agee, Brett)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs by Changing Course Foundation (With attachments)(Agee, Brett)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, ) by Changing Course Foundation (With attachments)(Agee, Brett)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ron Wright on behalf of Steven P. Burrough, Rosalind G. Sorrell (Wright, Ron)
November 25, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 11/25/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1320429 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Changing Course Foundation (Agee, Brett)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brett Agee on behalf of Changing Course Foundation (Agee, Brett)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 12/2/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Murray County District Court, case number CJ-2019-055 by Changing Course Foundation (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Changing Course Foundation (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Changing Course Foundation, Kim Hale, Murray County Board of County Commissioners by Steven Burrough, Rosalind G. Sorrell (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burrough et al v. Changing Course Foundation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Changing Course Foundation
Represented By: Brett Agee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Burrough
Represented By: Fob F. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalind G. Sorrell
Represented By: Fob F. Jones
Represented By: Ron Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven P. Burrough
Represented By: Fob F. Jones
Represented By: Ron Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray County Board of County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Air Donkey LLC
Represented By: Ron Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?