Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Hochatown Saloon, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Round Hill Music, LP, Post Oak Publishing, Tokeco Tunes, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Hell Pony Music and Bocephus Music, Inc.
Defendant: Hochatown Saloon, LLC and Scott Christian
Case Number: 6:2019cv00417
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs, LLC) by Sony/ATV Songs, LLC (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
January 14, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Post Oak Publishing (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
January 14, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Round Hill Music, LP (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hell Pony Music (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
January 14, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tokeco Tunes (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate TEGNA, Inc. by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth) Modified on 1/15/2020: added Other Affiliate (nm, Deputy Clerk).
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bocephus Music, Inc. (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Hochatown Saloon, LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Scott Christian (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tiffany Browning on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Browning, Tiffany)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elizabeth R. Sharrock on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
December 11, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 12/11/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1324048 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bocephus Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Hell Pony Music, Post Oak Publishing, Round Hill Music, LP, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Tokeco Tunes (Sharrock, Elizabeth)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 12/16/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Scott Christian, Hochatown Saloon, LLC by Bocephus Music, Inc., Hell Pony Music, Post Oak Publishing, Broadcast Music, Inc., Round Hill Music, LP, Tokeco Tunes, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Bocephus Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Hell Pony Music, Post Oak Publishing, Round Hill Music, LP, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Tokeco Tunes (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Hochatown Saloon, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Sharrock
Represented By: Tiffany Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Round Hill Music, LP
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Sharrock
Represented By: Tiffany Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Post Oak Publishing
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Sharrock
Represented By: Tiffany Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tokeco Tunes
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Sharrock
Represented By: Tiffany Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Sharrock
Represented By: Tiffany Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hell Pony Music
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Sharrock
Represented By: Tiffany Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bocephus Music, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Sharrock
Represented By: Tiffany Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hochatown Saloon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?