Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company v. Claudia Palliyo, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Claudia Palliyo, Inc. and Cassandra Lee
Case Number: 6:2019cv00418
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 3/30/2020 at 9:45 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 3/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 12/11/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1324101 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company (sms, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 12/18/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Claudia Palliyo, Inc., Cassandra Lee by Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company v. Claudia Palliyo, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Palliyo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Alliance Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard W. Wassall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?