Key et al v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Fitzgerald Farms, LLC, Theodore M. Key and Thomas E. Wheeler
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation and XTO Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00424
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations and Brief in Support by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XTO Energy, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 2/20/2020(Ratliff, Shannon)
February 6, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XTO Energy, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 2/20/2020(Ratliff, Shannon)
February 6, 2020 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Shannon H. Ratliff on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XTO Energy, Inc. (Ratliff, Shannon)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 3/30/2020 at 10:15 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 3/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Answers or Other Responsive Pleadings to the Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Docket Entry #19 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint by FEBRUARY 6, 2020.(adw, Deputy Clerk)
January 14, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Other Responsive Pleadings (Re: #18 Amended Complaint) by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XTO Energy, Inc. Responses due by 1/28/2020(Walker, L.)
January 9, 2020 Filing 18 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Theodore M. Key, Thomas E. Wheeler, Fitzgerald Farms, LLC (With attachments)(Sharp, Rex)
January 3, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by L. Mark Walker on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XTO Energy, Inc. (Walker, L.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name and Email Addresses by Fitzgerald Farms, LLC, Theodore M. Key, Thomas E. Wheeler (Sharp, Rex)
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk granting Defendants' First Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint ( #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer). Accordingly, defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, and XTO Energy Inc. have until 1/23/2020 to file their answer or otherwise plead. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Serve Other Responsive Pleadings (Re: #2 Complaint) by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XTO Energy, Inc. Responses due by 1/10/2020(Griffin, John)
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John J. Griffin, Jr on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XTO Energy, Inc. (Griffin, John)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of Judge Ronald A. White and at the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-19-424-KEW. (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan C. Hudson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hudson, Ryan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rex A. Sharp on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sharp, Rex)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Barbara C. Frankland on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Frankland, Barbara)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Margaret E. Robertson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Robertson, Margaret)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan K. Wilson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wilson, Ryan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to XTO Energy, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Exxon Mobil Corporation (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 12/17/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1325471 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Fitzgerald Farms, LLC, Theodore M. Key, Thomas E. Wheeler (Bradford, Reagan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. (Filing Fee due by 12/23/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/16/2019 to delete PDF (pjw, Deputy Clerk).
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XTO Energy, Inc. by Theodore M. Key, Thomas E. Wheeler, Fitzgerald Farms, LLC (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Fitzgerald Farms, LLC, Theodore M. Key, Thomas E. Wheeler (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Key et al v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: John J. Griffin, Jr.
Represented By: L. Mark Walker
Represented By: Shannon H. Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: John J. Griffin, Jr.
Represented By: L. Mark Walker
Represented By: Shannon H. Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XTO Energy, Inc.
Represented By: John J. Griffin, Jr.
Represented By: L. Mark Walker
Represented By: Shannon H. Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitzgerald Farms, LLC
Represented By: Reagan E. Bradford
Represented By: Margaret E. Robertson
Represented By: Ryan K. Wilson
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Ryan C. Hudson
Represented By: Barbara C. Frankland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore M. Key
Represented By: Reagan E. Bradford
Represented By: Margaret E. Robertson
Represented By: Ryan K. Wilson
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Ryan C. Hudson
Represented By: Barbara C. Frankland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Wheeler
Represented By: Reagan E. Bradford
Represented By: Margaret E. Robertson
Represented By: Ryan K. Wilson
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Ryan C. Hudson
Represented By: Barbara C. Frankland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?