Kim v. Murray State College Board of Regents
Plaintiff: Yoon S. Kim
Defendant: Murray State College Board of Regents
Case Number: 6:2019cv00431
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #15 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Petition. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Amend Petition (Re: #9 Amended Complaint) by Yoon S. Kim *** Part 2 of two part document (See pleading #14 ); Responses due by 3/2/2020(dma, Deputy Clerk)
February 17, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #11 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Case) by Yoon S. Kim *** Part 1 of two part document (See pleading #15 ) (Stone, S.) Modified on 2/19/2020 to edit text (dma, Deputy Clerk).
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #12 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Plaintiff's Response due on or before 2/17/2020. (Re: #11 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Case) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #11 Partial MOTION to Dismiss) by Yoon S. Kim Responses due by 2/26/2020(Stone, S.) Modified on 2/13/2020 to edit event and add link (tls, Deputy Clerk).
January 27, 2020 Filing 11 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by Murray State College Board of Regents (With attachments) Responses due by 2/10/2020(Coffey, Dixie)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White : In light of the First Amended Complaint filed 1/13/2020, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed 1/2/2020 ( #6 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim) is hereby deemed as MOOT. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Murray State College Board of Regents (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Yoon S. Kim (Stone, S.) Modified on 1/17/2020 to edit party (dma, Deputy Clerk).
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by S. Corey Stone on behalf of Yoon S. Kim (Stone, S.)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White inviting plaintiff to file an amended complaint providing additional factual averments which may vitiate defendant's claims of insufficiency no later than 1/13/2020(lal, Deputy Clerk) (Modified to attach PDF and regenerate NEF on 1/9/2020)(lal, Deputy Clerk).
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by Murray State College Board of Regents (With attachments) Responses due by 1/16/2020(Zamarripa, Jacqueline)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jacqueline R. Zamarripa on behalf of Murray State College Board of Regents (Zamarripa, Jacqueline)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Dixie L. Coffey on behalf of Murray State College Board of Regents (Coffey, Dixie)
December 26, 2019 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 12/26/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1327467 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Murray State College Board of Regents (Coffey, Dixie)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 1/2/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Johnston County District Court, case number CJ-2019-024 by Murray State College Board of Regents (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Murray State College Board of Regents (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Murray State College Board of Regents by Yoon S. Kim (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim v. Murray State College Board of Regents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yoon S. Kim
Represented By: Jim Cole Pettis
Represented By: S. Corey Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray State College Board of Regents
Represented By: Dixie L. Coffey
Represented By: Jacqueline R. Zamarripa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?