Cloud v. Esper
Plaintiff: Billy D. Cloud
Defendant: Dr. Mark T. Esper and Mark T. Esper
Case Number: 6:2020cv00004
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Mark T. Esper - Served on 1/21/2020 by serving Brian J. Kuester, U.S. Attorney by Billy D. Cloud (Hurst, Amber)
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brandon Douglas Roberts on behalf of Billy D. Cloud (Roberts, Brandon)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Hammons on behalf of Billy D. Cloud (Hammons, Mark)
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amber L. Hurst on behalf of Billy D. Cloud (Hurst, Amber)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Joe Heaton: directing Plaintiff to file an entry of appearance conforming to LCvR83.4 not later than 01/09/2020. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Mark T. Esper - U. S. Attorney (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Mark T. Esper - U.S. Attorney General (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Joe Heaton of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-20-004-JH. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
January 6, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 1/6/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1329211 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Billy D. Cloud (Hurst, Amber)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. ( Filing Fee due by 1/13/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Mark T. Esper by Billy D. Cloud (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Billy D. Cloud (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cloud v. Esper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy D. Cloud
Represented By: Amber L. Hurst
Represented By: Brandon Douglas Roberts
Represented By: Mark Hammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mark T. Esper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T. Esper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?