Jackson v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Plaintiff: Eric Jackson
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Case Number: 6:2020cv00056
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 17 JUDGMENT by Judge Joe Heaton case is dismissed with prejudice. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Joe Heaton granting #10 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing case. (case terminated) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 31, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Wells Fargo Bank, NA ;(Hardin, Mark)
March 25, 2020 Filing 14 Amended RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Eric Jackson ;(Webster, Teressa)
March 20, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Eric Jackson ;(Webster, Teressa)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Joe Heaton granting #11 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Plaintiff's Response due by 3/20/2020 (Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss) (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #10 Motion to Dismiss) by Eric Jackson Responses due by 3/27/2020(Webster, Teressa) Modified on 3/17/2020 to edit event and add link (tls, Deputy Clerk).
February 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Wells Fargo Bank, NA (With attachments) Responses due by 3/13/2020(Hardin, Mark)
February 26, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Teressa L. Webster on behalf of Eric Jackson (Webster, Teressa)
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, NA) by Wells Fargo Bank, NA (Hardin, Mark)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Hardin on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, NA (Hardin, Mark)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Joe Heaton: Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint due not later than 3/2/2020. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Joe Heaton directing Counsel for the parties to file an entry of appearance conforming to LCvR83.4 not later than 2/26/2020. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Joe Heaton of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-20-56-JH. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 2/21/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1343175 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Wells Fargo Bank, NA (Hardin, Mark)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 2/28/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Wagoner County District Court, case number CJ-20-009 by Wells Fargo Bank, NA (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Wells Fargo Bank, NA (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Wells Fargo Bank, NA by Eric Jackson (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Jackson
Represented By: Teressa L. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Represented By: Jake G. Pipinich
Represented By: Mark Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?