Avant v. Doke et al
Plaintiff: Gary A. Avant
Defendant: Ken Doke
Case Number: 6:2020cv00067
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Referring Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 14 DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Ken Doke(in his official capacity as a County Commissioner for Muskogee County), Ken Doke(individually) (Carr, Michael)
April 10, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All previoulsy scheduled deadlines and hearings set before Magistrate Kimberly E. West are hereby stricken. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 20-67-RAW. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andy A. Artus on behalf of Ken Doke(in his official capacity as a County Commissioner for Muskogee County), Ken Doke(individually) (Artus, Andy)
March 30, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Ken Doke(in his official capacity as a County Commissioner for Muskogee County), Ken Doke(individually) (Carr, Michael)
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael L. Carr on behalf of Ken Doke(in his official capacity as a County Commissioner for Muskogee County), Ken Doke(individually) (Carr, Michael)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 5/28/2020 at 11:00 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 5/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk)
March 16, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary A. Avant; Service made on Ken Doke on 3/11/20 (Hammons, Mark) Modified on 3/23/2020 to edit text (dma, Deputy Clerk).
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Ken Doke (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brandon Douglas Roberts on behalf of Gary A. Avant (Roberts, Brandon)
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amber L. Hurst on behalf of Gary A. Avant (Hurst, Amber)
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Hammons on behalf of Gary A. Avant (Hammons, Mark)
March 6, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 3/6/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1347906 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Gary A. Avant (Hammons, Mark)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 3/13/2020) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ken Doke (in his official capacity as a County Commissioner for Muskogee County), Ken Doke (individually) by Gary A. Avant (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Gary A. Avant (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avant v. Doke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Doke
Represented By: Michael L. Carr
Represented By: Andy A. Artus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary A. Avant
Represented By: Mark Hammons
Represented By: Brandon Douglas Roberts
Represented By: Amber L. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?