Soap v. C.V.'s Foodliner, Inc.
Plaintiff: Darlene Soap
Defendant: C.V.'s Foodliner, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv00073
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Steven P Shreder
Referring Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to C.V.'s Foodliner, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Charles C. Vaught on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vaught, Charles)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court and due to related Case No. CIV-20-72-SPS, this case is hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-20-73-SPS. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
March 16, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 3/16/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1350183 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Darlene Soap (Vaught, Charles)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 3/20/2020) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against C.V.'s Foodliner, Inc. by Darlene Soap (With attachment) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Darlene Soap (pjw, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soap v. C.V.'s Foodliner, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.V.'s Foodliner, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Soap
Represented By: Charles C. Vaught
Represented By: Jessica N. Vaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?