Walden v. LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners
Plaintiff: Harvey Dewayne Walden
Defendant: LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners
Case Number: 6:2020cv00079
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ambre C. Gooch on behalf of LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners (Gooch, Ambre)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael L. Carr on behalf of LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners (Carr, Michael)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners [NOTE: Attorney Michael L. Carr added to party LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners(pty:dft)]. (Carr, Michael)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners - Served on 3/26/2020. by Harvey Dewayne Walden (Wright, Thomas)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 3/18/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1351280 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Harvey Dewayne Walden (Wright, Thomas)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. (Filing Fee due by 3/25/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners by Harvey Dewayne Walden (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Harvey Dewayne Walden (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walden v. LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeFlore County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Michael L. Carr
Represented By: Ambre C. Gooch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Dewayne Walden
Represented By: Thomas M. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?