Winningham v. Broken Arrow, City of et al
Plaintiff: John W. Winningham, Jr.
Defendant: Broken Arrow, City of, Broken Arrow Police, T. Jesse, Tulsa County of Oklahoma, L. Rademacher and Sallisaw City of
Case Number: 6:2020cv00086
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER to Plaintiff with Summons forms (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT (Re: #2 Complaint ) by John W. Winningham, Jr (With attachments)(lal, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 5/5/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number OKE017983 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by John W. Winningham, Jr (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting plaintiff's motion to extend time to pay filing fee ( #6 Motion to Extend Deadline(s)) and extending deadline to 5/1/2020. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Deadline(s) by John W. Winningham, Jr (With attachments) Responses due by 4/27/2020(lal, Deputy Clerk)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Filing Fee due within fifteen (15) days. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by John W. Winningham, Jr Responses due by 4/8/2020(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. ( Filing Fee due by 4/1/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Broken Arrow Police, Broken Arrow, City of, T. Jesse, L. Rademacher, Sallisaw City of, Tulsa County of Oklahoma by John W. Winningham, Jr (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by John W. Winningham, Jr (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winningham v. Broken Arrow, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broken Arrow, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broken Arrow Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Jesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa County of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Rademacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallisaw City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Winningham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?