Redbird Business Group, LLC et al v. Harrison
Plaintiff: Brewer Attorneys & Counselors, Redbird Business Group, LLC, Redbird Bioscience Oklahoma, LLC, RB RealtyCo, LLC and BCM, LLC
Defendant: Matthew Harrison
Case Number: 6:2020cv00098
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Ronald A White
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #13 Partial MOTION to Dismiss ) by All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/12/2020(Byars, Joe)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Matthew Harrison (With attachments) Responses due by 6/1/2020(Cooper, R.)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: In light of the Second Amended Complaint filed 5/6/2020, Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed 4/20/2020 ( #8 Motion to Dismiss) is denied as moot. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint) by Redbird Business Group, LLC, Redbird Bioscience Oklahoma, LLC, Brewer Attorneys & Counselors, RB RealtyCo, LLC and BCM, LLC (With attachments)(Byars, Joe) Modified on 5/8/2020 to add filer (dma, Deputy Clerk).
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joe D. Byars, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Byars, Joe)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White inviting Plaintiffs, if they so desire, to file an amended complaint by 5/6/2020, providing additional factual averments which may vitiate Defendant's claims of insufficiency. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Matthew Harrison (With attachments) Responses due by 5/4/2020(Cooper, R.)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting Defendant Matthew Harrison's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead ( #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer) and extending deadline to 4/20/2020 (lal, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Matthew Harrison Responses due by 4/22/2020(Cooper, R.)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeff Roderick on behalf of Matthew Harrison (Roderick, Jeff)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order FILING FEES Paid in Full on 4/2/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1355314 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal) by Matthew Harrison (sms, Deputy Clerk)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by R. Casey Cooper on behalf of Matthew Harrison (Cooper, R.)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 4/9/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Adair County District Court, case number CJ-2020-14 by Matthew Harrison (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added replacing Exhibit 4 and NEF regenerated on 4/3/2020) (lal, Deputy Clerk).
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Matthew Harrison (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Matthew Harrison by Redbird Business Group, LLC, Redbird Bioscience Oklahoma, LLC, Brewer Attorneys & Counselors, RB RealtyCo, LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redbird Business Group, LLC et al v. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Harrison
Represented By: R. Casey Cooper
Represented By: Jeff Roderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brewer Attorneys & Counselors
Represented By: Fourth Scoufos
Represented By: Joe D. Byars, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redbird Business Group, LLC
Represented By: Fourth Scoufos
Represented By: Joe D. Byars, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redbird Bioscience Oklahoma, LLC
Represented By: Fourth Scoufos
Represented By: Joe D. Byars, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RB RealtyCo, LLC
Represented By: Fourth Scoufos
Represented By: Joe D. Byars, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BCM, LLC
Represented By: Fourth Scoufos
Represented By: Joe D. Byars, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?