Woods v. ELSR Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Harlianne Woods
Defendant: ELSR Management, LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00100
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Kimberly E West
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: ELSR Management, LLC - Served on 5/30/2020. by Harlianne Woods (Vaught, Charles)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to ELSR Management, LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
April 6, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 4/6/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1356018 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Harlianne Woods (Vaught, Charles)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 4/13/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against ELSR Management, LLC by Harlianne Woods (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Harlianne Woods (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. ELSR Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harlianne Woods
Represented By: Charles C. Vaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELSR Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?