Kirkland Audio, LLC et al v. BMG Sales, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gerald Kirkland and Kirkland Audio, LLC
Defendant: Jason Paul Black, BMG Sales, LLC doing business as Mahindra of Oklahoma and Jason Paul Blake
Case Number: 6:2020cv00238
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Steven P Shreder
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 First CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent BMG Sales, LLC for BMG Sales, LLC, Jason Paul Blake) by BMG Sales, LLC, Jason Paul Blake (Adams, Ranada)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #8 Appearance - Attorney ) by BMG Sales, LLC, Jason Paul Blake (Adams, Ranada)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ranada D. Adams on behalf of BMG Sales, LLC, Jason Paul Blake (Adams, Ranada)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ranada D. Adams on behalf of All Defendants (Adams, Ranada)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Jason Paul Blake - Served on 8/10/2020 via personal process server by Kirkland Audio, LLC and Gerald Kirkland (lal, Deputy Clerk)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: BMG Sales, LLC - Served on 8/10/2020 via personal process server by Kirkland Audio, LLC and Gerald Kirkland (lal, Deputy Clerk)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to BMG Sales, LLC (nm, Deputy Clerk)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jason Paul Blake (nm, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2020 FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/22/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1384285 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Kirkland Audio, LLC (Lovin, William)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of District Judge John F. Heil, III and at the direction of the Court, this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-20-238-SPS. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2020 ***Remark: Email notification of initiating event to Patent & Trademark Office. (jcb, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BMG Sales, LLC, Jason Paul Blake by Kirkland Audio, LLC, Gerald Kirkland (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 7/21/2020 to correct party (jcb, Deputy Clerk).
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Gerald Kirkland, Kirkland Audio, LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirkland Audio, LLC et al v. BMG Sales, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Paul Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMG Sales, LLC doing business as Mahindra of Oklahoma
Represented By: Ranada D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Paul Blake
Represented By: Ranada D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Kirkland
Represented By: William R. Lovin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirkland Audio, LLC
Represented By: William R. Lovin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?